THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 17:05:15 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre;
Hotel Dieu Hospital site:
Dept of Psychiatry;
166 Brock Street, Brock 5; #B5-025
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 2554
Fax: (613) 544-7623

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Khalid-Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khalid-Khan (CPSO#: 88256 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Suite B5-025
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400 Extn: 2554

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre;
Hotel Dieu Hospital site:
Dept of Psychiatry;
166 Brock Street, Brock 5; #B5-025
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 2554
Fax: (613) 544-7623

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Khalid-Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khalid-Khan (CPSO#: 88256 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Suite B5-025
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400 Extn: 2554

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAROSH KHALID-KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALID-KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAROSH KHALID-KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALID-KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dow Medical College, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2008