THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:36:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Colonel By Dr
Department of National Defence
Carling Campus, 9S.1
Directorate Force Health Protection
Ottawa ON K1A 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-901-9374
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diane Lu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lu (CPSO#: 88274 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Colonel By Dr
Department of National Defence
Carling Campus, 9S.1
Directorate Force Health Protection
Ottawa ON K1A 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-901-9374
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diane Lu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lu (CPSO#: 88274 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANE JANET LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANE JANET LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2008