THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:44:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-571-0822
Fax: 519-571-1210

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CATHERINE ANDRUS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Andrus (CPSO#: 88324 )
Business Address: 200-435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2

Corporation Name: Catherine Andrus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Apr 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-571-0822
Fax: 519-571-1210

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CATHERINE ANDRUS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Andrus (CPSO#: 88324 )
Business Address: 200-435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2

Corporation Name: Catherine Andrus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Apr 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE LYNN ANDRUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDRUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE LYNN ANDRUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDRUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008