THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 17:05:50 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19798 Alton, Unit 101
Alton Ontario L7K 0E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 942-2222
Fax: (519) 341-1579
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.J. Greer-Bayramoglu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Greer-Bayramoglu (CPSO#: 88335 )
Business Address: Suite 101
19798 Main Street
Alton Ontario L7K 0E4
(519) 942-2222
Business Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19798 Alton, Unit 101
Alton Ontario L7K 0E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 942-2222
Fax: (519) 341-1579
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.J. Greer-Bayramoglu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Greer-Bayramoglu (CPSO#: 88335 )
Business Address: Suite 101
19798 Main Street
Alton Ontario L7K 0E4
(519) 942-2222
Business Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA JANE GREER-BAYRAMOGLU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREER-BAYRAMOGLU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA JANE GREER-BAYRAMOGLU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREER-BAYRAMOGLU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008