THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:50:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500 Mohawk Road West
Banyan Community Services
Hamilton Ontario L9C 1X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-775-1298
Fax: 905-549-9011
Address: 688 Queensdale Ave E
Banyan Community Services
Suite 2B
Hamilton ON L8V 1M1
Phone: 905-545-0133
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2A5
Phone: 9057301330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1188 Vanier Drive
Kinark Child and Family Services
Mississauga Ontario L5H 3X1
Phone: 905-844-4110
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Syl Apps Youth Center
475 Iroquois Shore Rd
Oakville, ON
L6H 1M3
Oakville Ontario L6H 1M3
Phone: 905-844-4110
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 08 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christina McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. C. McDonald (CPSO#: 88349 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500 Mohawk Road West
Banyan Community Services
Hamilton Ontario L9C 1X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-775-1298
Fax: 905-549-9011
Address: 688 Queensdale Ave E
Banyan Community Services
Suite 2B
Hamilton ON L8V 1M1
Phone: 905-545-0133
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2A5
Phone: 9057301330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1188 Vanier Drive
Kinark Child and Family Services
Mississauga Ontario L5H 3X1
Phone: 905-844-4110
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Syl Apps Youth Center
475 Iroquois Shore Rd
Oakville, ON
L6H 1M3
Oakville Ontario L6H 1M3
Phone: 905-844-4110
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 08 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christina McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. C. McDonald (CPSO#: 88349 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008