THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:44:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
1275 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8Y 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 945-8623
Fax: (519) 945-5708
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Zakaria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zakaria (CPSO#: 88378 )
Business Address: Unit 2
1275 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8Y 4X9
(519) 945-8623
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
1275 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8Y 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 945-8623
Fax: (519) 945-5708
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Zakaria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zakaria (CPSO#: 88378 )
Business Address: Unit 2
1275 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8Y 4X9
(519) 945-8623
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH DANIEL ZAKARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKARIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH DANIEL ZAKARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKARIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008