THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:03:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department Of Anesthesia
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33853
Fax: (905) 524-6019
Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: 5197127871
Fax: No Information Available
Address: JHCC
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Fax: No Information Available
Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anesthesia
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: HGH
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Fax: No Information Available
Address: GHA Surgical Centre
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Z9
Phone: (905) 575-5743
Extension: 202
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Charlton Digestive Disease Centre
Charlton Digestive Disease Centre
25 Charlton Ave East
Suite 406
Phone: 9055267002
Extension: 3123
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Kostandoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kostandoff (CPSO#: 88403 )
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 527-0271
Business Address: 32 - 1960 Appleby Line
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-0271
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department Of Anesthesia
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33853
Fax: (905) 524-6019
Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: 5197127871
Fax: No Information Available
Address: JHCC
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Fax: No Information Available
Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anesthesia
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: HGH
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Fax: No Information Available
Address: GHA Surgical Centre
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Z9
Phone: (905) 575-5743
Extension: 202
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Charlton Digestive Disease Centre
Charlton Digestive Disease Centre
25 Charlton Ave East
Suite 406
Phone: 9055267002
Extension: 3123
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Kostandoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kostandoff (CPSO#: 88403 )
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 527-0271
Business Address: 32 - 1960 Appleby Line
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-0271
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY HUNTER KOSTANDOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSTANDOFF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY HUNTER KOSTANDOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSTANDOFF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008