THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:48:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher N.C. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Smith (CPSO#: 88427 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher N.C. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Smith (CPSO#: 88427 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER NORMAN CHARLES SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER NORMAN CHARLES SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Dec 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008