THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:26:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 5
5303 Canotek Road
Ottawa Ontario K1J 9M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 742-1230
Fax: (613) 742-1323

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael J Aiello Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aiello (CPSO#: 88430 )
Business Address: Suite 8
5303 Canotek Road
Ottawa Ontario K1J 9M1
(613) 742-1230

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 5
5303 Canotek Road
Ottawa Ontario K1J 9M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 742-1230
Fax: (613) 742-1323

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael J Aiello Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aiello (CPSO#: 88430 )
Business Address: Suite 8
5303 Canotek Road
Ottawa Ontario K1J 9M1
(613) 742-1230

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN AIELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AIELLO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN AIELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AIELLO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008