THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:39:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 308
1 Young Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 777-8448
Fax: (905) 525-5681
Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare
100 West Fifth street
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel Turcan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Turcan (CPSO#: 88433 )
Business Address: Suite 308
1 Young Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
(905) 777-8448

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 308
1 Young Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 777-8448
Fax: (905) 525-5681
Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare
100 West Fifth street
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel Turcan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Turcan (CPSO#: 88433 )
Business Address: Suite 308
1 Young Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
(905) 777-8448

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL CHRISTINA TURCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURCAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL CHRISTINA TURCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURCAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008