THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:50:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 370 Speedvale Avenue West
Public Health Agency of Canada
Guelph Ontario N1H7M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 247 Centennial Parkway North
Hamilton Ontario L8E 2X3
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dean A. Raso and Dr. Andrea D. Chittle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chittle (CPSO#: 88446 ) Dr. D. Raso (CPSO#: 86220 )
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 4J4

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea D. Chittle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Feb 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 370 Speedvale Avenue West
Public Health Agency of Canada
Guelph Ontario N1H7M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 247 Centennial Parkway North
Hamilton Ontario L8E 2X3
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dean A. Raso and Dr. Andrea D. Chittle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chittle (CPSO#: 88446 ) Dr. D. Raso (CPSO#: 86220 )
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 4J4

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea D. Chittle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Feb 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA DIANE CHITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHITTLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA DIANE CHITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHITTLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008