THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:02:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Pontificia Bolivariana, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Bronte St S
Treehouse Pediatrics
302
Milton, ON, L9T9M2
Milton ON L9T 9M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-876-5056
Fax: 289-670-2176
Address: 470 Chrysler
27
Brampton ON L6S 0C1
Phone: 6475454080
Fax: 6474948687
Address: 725 Bronte Street South
Milton District Hospital
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
Phone: 905 878 2383
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Colombia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Tamayo Estrada Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tamayo Estrada (CPSO#: 88458 )
Business Address: Building C
1-604 Santa Maria Boulevard
Milton Ontario L9T 9L7
(905) 878-0055
Business Address: 10 Bronte St S
Suite 302
Milton ON L9T 9M2
9058765056

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Pontificia Bolivariana, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Bronte St S
Treehouse Pediatrics
302
Milton, ON, L9T9M2
Milton ON L9T 9M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-876-5056
Fax: 289-670-2176
Address: 470 Chrysler
27
Brampton ON L6S 0C1
Phone: 6475454080
Fax: 6474948687
Address: 725 Bronte Street South
Milton District Hospital
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
Phone: 905 878 2383
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Colombia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Tamayo Estrada Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tamayo Estrada (CPSO#: 88458 )
Business Address: Building C
1-604 Santa Maria Boulevard
Milton Ontario L9T 9L7
(905) 878-0055
Business Address: 10 Bronte St S
Suite 302
Milton ON L9T 9M2
9058765056

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATALINA MARIA TAMAYO ESTRADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMAYO ESTRADA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATALINA MARIA TAMAYO ESTRADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMAYO ESTRADA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Pontificia Bolivariana, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008