THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:21:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204
100 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 745 5557
Fax: 416 745 1990

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maria Bagovich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bagovich (CPSO#: 88488 )
Business Address: Suite 204
100 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 5G4
(416) 745-5557

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204
100 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 745 5557
Fax: 416 745 1990

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maria Bagovich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bagovich (CPSO#: 88488 )
Business Address: Suite 204
100 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 5G4
(416) 745-5557

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA ANA BAGOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGOVICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA ANA BAGOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGOVICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008