THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 16:59:20 PM

General Information

Former Name: Becks, Alison Heather (Used Until: 06 Jul 2008)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brightshores Health System
1800 8th St E
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-376-2121
Extension: 2535
Fax: 1-866-505-1121

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alison Barfoot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Barfoot (CPSO#: 88489 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Address: Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8

General Information

Former Name: Becks, Alison Heather (Used Until: 06 Jul 2008)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brightshores Health System
1800 8th St E
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-376-2121
Extension: 2535
Fax: 1-866-505-1121

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alison Barfoot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Barfoot (CPSO#: 88489 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Address: Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISON HEATHER BARFOOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARFOOT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISON HEATHER BARFOOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARFOOT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008