THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:25:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: Finch, Cara Elizabeth (Used Until: 26 Sep 2010)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 211
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 797-0800
Fax: (705) 797-0900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cara Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Davidson (CPSO#: 88500 )
Business Address: Suite 211
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 797-0800

General Information

Former Name: Finch, Cara Elizabeth (Used Until: 26 Sep 2010)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 211
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 797-0800
Fax: (705) 797-0900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cara Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Davidson (CPSO#: 88500 )
Business Address: Suite 211
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 797-0800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARA ELIZABETH DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARA ELIZABETH DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008