THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:01:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-824-1010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Guelph Community Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
176 Wyndham Street North
Guelph Ontario N1H 8N9
Phone: (519) 821-6638
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jul 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 19 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcel Parent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Parent (CPSO#: 88535 )
Business Address: 1 - 176 Wyndham Street North
Guelph Ontario N1H 8N9
(519) 821-6638
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350
Business Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
(519) 843-2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-824-1010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Guelph Community Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
176 Wyndham Street North
Guelph Ontario N1H 8N9
Phone: (519) 821-6638
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jul 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 19 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcel Parent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Parent (CPSO#: 88535 )
Business Address: 1 - 176 Wyndham Street North
Guelph Ontario N1H 8N9
(519) 821-6638
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350
Business Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
(519) 843-2010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCEL PATRICE FERNAND PARENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARENT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCEL PATRICE FERNAND PARENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARENT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008