THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:15:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ESTONIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 400
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 748-2020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 377 Church St.
Suite 302
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-7360
Fax: (905) 472-7148
Address: Suite 513
2425 Bloor St. West
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 760-8763
Fax: (416) 689-2276

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Hess Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hess (CPSO#: 88558 )
Business Address: 73 Sir Williams Lane
Etobicoke ON M9A 1V2
6474058448

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ESTONIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 400
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 748-2020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 377 Church St.
Suite 302
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-7360
Fax: (905) 472-7148
Address: Suite 513
2425 Bloor St. West
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 760-8763
Fax: (416) 689-2276

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Hess Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hess (CPSO#: 88558 )
Business Address: 73 Sir Williams Lane
Etobicoke ON M9A 1V2
6474058448

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIIU MAI HESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIIU MAI HESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008