THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:08:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Quality Medical Clinic
1375 Baseline Road
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-627-3901
Fax: 613-627-3902
Address: Rideau-Rockcliffe Family Medicine
595 Montreal Rd., Suite 400
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
Phone: 613-695-6900
Fax: 613-695-6464

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Teaching Canada - British Columbia
PROFESSION: Teaching
JURISDICTION: Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Lange Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lange (CPSO#: 88573 )
Business Address: 1375 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 0A8
(613) 627-3901
Business Address: Suite 400
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Quality Medical Clinic
1375 Baseline Road
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-627-3901
Fax: 613-627-3902
Address: Rideau-Rockcliffe Family Medicine
595 Montreal Rd., Suite 400
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
Phone: 613-695-6900
Fax: 613-695-6464

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Teaching Canada - British Columbia
PROFESSION: Teaching
JURISDICTION: Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Lange Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lange (CPSO#: 88573 )
Business Address: 1375 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 0A8
(613) 627-3901
Business Address: Suite 400
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARNEY HARRY LANGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARNEY HARRY LANGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Feb 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008