THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:44:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-749-4300
Fax: 519-749-4378

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Lumsden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lumsden (CPSO#: 88584 )
Business Address: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300 Extn: 5715

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-749-4300
Fax: 519-749-4378

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Lumsden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lumsden (CPSO#: 88584 )
Business Address: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300 Extn: 5715

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN MARY SHELLEY LUMSDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUMSDEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN MARY SHELLEY LUMSDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUMSDEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008