THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 20:44:57 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-800-267-6522
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 24 Oct 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanna Bostwick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bostwick (CPSO#: 88592 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-800-267-6522
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 24 Oct 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanna Bostwick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bostwick (CPSO#: 88592 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNA ALEXIS BOSTWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSTWICK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNA ALEXIS BOSTWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSTWICK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008