THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:16:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2724 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7P 2W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136501545
Fax: 6135310674

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Beyea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Beyea (CPSO#: 88598 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
144 Brock Street
Murray Building
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2724 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7P 2W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136501545
Fax: 6135310674

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Beyea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Beyea (CPSO#: 88598 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
144 Brock Street
Murray Building
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON ATKINS BEYEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEYEA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON ATKINS BEYEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEYEA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008