THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:12:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Mysore, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System.St Catharines
Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Avella Injury and Pain Clinic
5045 Mainway,Unit 118
Burlington
Burlington Ontario L7L 5Z1
Phone: 9053157007
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Interventional Radiology
Effective: 05 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 02 Jun 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Interventional Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Athreya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Athreya (CPSO#: 88609 )
Business Address: Niagara Health System
Medical Imaging
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Mysore, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System.St Catharines
Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Avella Injury and Pain Clinic
5045 Mainway,Unit 118
Burlington
Burlington Ontario L7L 5Z1
Phone: 9053157007
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Interventional Radiology
Effective: 05 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 02 Jun 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Interventional Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Athreya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Athreya (CPSO#: 88609 )
Business Address: Niagara Health System
Medical Imaging
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Jan 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 29 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sriharsha Athreya may practise medicine independently in Diagnostic
Radiology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sriharsha Athreya may practise medicine independently in Diagnostic
Radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Mysore, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2008