THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:20:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON
Hamilton Ontario L8N4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-4941
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Langmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Langmann (CPSO#: 88617 )
Business Address: St Joseph Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-4941

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON
Hamilton Ontario L8N4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-4941
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Langmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Langmann (CPSO#: 88617 )
Business Address: St Joseph Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-4941

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAILLIN LANGMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGMANN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAILLIN LANGMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGMANN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008