THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 07:09:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Tapiola Cres
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa Ontario K1T 2J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-0303
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marina Lozano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lozano (CPSO#: 88691 )
Business Address: 25 Tapiola Crescent
Ottawa Ontario K1T 2J7
(613) 738-0303

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Tapiola Cres
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa Ontario K1T 2J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-0303
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marina Lozano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lozano (CPSO#: 88691 )
Business Address: 25 Tapiola Crescent
Ottawa Ontario K1T 2J7
(613) 738-0303

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARINA LOZANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOZANO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARINA LOZANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOZANO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008