THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:58:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 210
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 680-9092
Fax: (613) 680-9093

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 19 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HASINA VISRAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Visram (CPSO#: 88749 )
Business Address: 770 Broadview Avenue
Unit 210
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3

Corporation Name: Varghese Visram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Mar 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 210
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 680-9092
Fax: (613) 680-9093

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 19 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HASINA VISRAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Visram (CPSO#: 88749 )
Business Address: 770 Broadview Avenue
Unit 210
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3

Corporation Name: Varghese Visram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Mar 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASINA VISRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VISRAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASINA VISRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VISRAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008