THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:45:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: Vanderspek, Carola Johanna Dorette (Used Until: 10 Aug 2009)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 29 Noxon St
Ingersoll ON N5C 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194259000
Fax: 5194859609
Address: Caressant Care Nursing Home
81 Fyfe Avenue
Woodstock Ontario N4S8Y2
Phone: 5195396461
Fax: 5195395629

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carola Collins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Collins (CPSO#: 88753 )
Business Address: 715180 Oxford Road 4
Woodstock Ontario N4S 7V9
(519) 537-8515 Extn: 5
Business Address: 81 Fyfe Avenue
Woodstock Ontario N4S 8Y2
(519) 539-6461
Business Address: 29 Noxon St
Ingersoll ON N5C 1B8
5194259000

General Information

Former Name: Vanderspek, Carola Johanna Dorette (Used Until: 10 Aug 2009)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 29 Noxon St
Ingersoll ON N5C 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194259000
Fax: 5194859609
Address: Caressant Care Nursing Home
81 Fyfe Avenue
Woodstock Ontario N4S8Y2
Phone: 5195396461
Fax: 5195395629

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carola Collins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Collins (CPSO#: 88753 )
Business Address: 715180 Oxford Road 4
Woodstock Ontario N4S 7V9
(519) 537-8515 Extn: 5
Business Address: 81 Fyfe Avenue
Woodstock Ontario N4S 8Y2
(519) 539-6461
Business Address: 29 Noxon St
Ingersoll ON N5C 1B8
5194259000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLA JOHANNA DORETTE COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLA JOHANNA DORETTE COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008