THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:32:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Baruch/Weisz Outpatient Care Clinic
GSE-140
4001 Leslie St
Willowdale Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (647) 494-8917

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.R. Bell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bell (CPSO#: 88772 ) Dr. L. Bell (CPSO#: 86827 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Willowdale Ontario M2K 1E1
(647) 490-1335

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Baruch/Weisz Outpatient Care Clinic
GSE-140
4001 Leslie St
Willowdale Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (647) 494-8917

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.R. Bell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bell (CPSO#: 88772 ) Dr. L. Bell (CPSO#: 86827 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Willowdale Ontario M2K 1E1
(647) 490-1335

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN RICHARD BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN RICHARD BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008