THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:28:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: Chan, Kathryn Jane (Used Until: 27 Jun 2010)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 205
555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland Ontario L3C 6B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 735-0725
Fax: (905) 735-8184

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathryn Janzen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Janzen (CPSO#: 88786 )
Business Address: 205 - 555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland Ontario L3C 6B5
(905) 735-0725

General Information

Former Name: Chan, Kathryn Jane (Used Until: 27 Jun 2010)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 205
555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland Ontario L3C 6B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 735-0725
Fax: (905) 735-8184

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathryn Janzen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Janzen (CPSO#: 88786 )
Business Address: 205 - 555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland Ontario L3C 6B5
(905) 735-0725

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN JANE JANZEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANZEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN JANE JANZEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANZEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008