THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 10:26:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Extension: 3434
Fax: (416) 603-5315
Address: 38 Major Street
Kensington Hospice
Toronto Ontario M5S 2L1
Phone: 4169639640
Fax: 4169639466
Address: GSH Medical Annex
481 Bloor street West
second floor
Toronto Ontario M5R 1Y8
Phone: (416) 928-0217
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Haley Draper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Draper (CPSO#: 88788 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Extension: 3434
Fax: (416) 603-5315
Address: 38 Major Street
Kensington Hospice
Toronto Ontario M5S 2L1
Phone: 4169639640
Fax: 4169639466
Address: GSH Medical Annex
481 Bloor street West
second floor
Toronto Ontario M5R 1Y8
Phone: (416) 928-0217
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Haley Draper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Draper (CPSO#: 88788 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HALEY ELANA DRAPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAPER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HALEY ELANA DRAPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAPER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008