THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 00:23:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hume Street Dental Care
304 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W1
Phone: (705) 445-2281
Fax: (705) 445-2285
Address: GHBS Markdale Hospital
P.O. Box 406
55 Isla Street
Markdale Ontario N0C 1H0
Phone: (519) 986-3040
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 229 Nelson St W
Brightshores Health System- Meaford Hospital
Meaford ON N4L 1A3
Phone: 519-538-1311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.C. Edgar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Edgar (CPSO#: 88791 )
Business Address: 229 Nelson St W
Meaford General Hospital
Meaford ON N4L 1A3
Business Address: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
(705) 445-2550
Business Address: 304 Hume Street
Hume Street Dental Care
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W1
(705) 445-2281

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hume Street Dental Care
304 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W1
Phone: (705) 445-2281
Fax: (705) 445-2285
Address: GHBS Markdale Hospital
P.O. Box 406
55 Isla Street
Markdale Ontario N0C 1H0
Phone: (519) 986-3040
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 229 Nelson St W
Brightshores Health System- Meaford Hospital
Meaford ON N4L 1A3
Phone: 519-538-1311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.C. Edgar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Edgar (CPSO#: 88791 )
Business Address: 229 Nelson St W
Meaford General Hospital
Meaford ON N4L 1A3
Business Address: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
(705) 445-2550
Business Address: 304 Hume Street
Hume Street Dental Care
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W1
(705) 445-2281

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON CATHERINE EDGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDGAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON CATHERINE EDGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDGAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008