THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:09:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Virich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Virich (CPSO#: 88794 )
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Virich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Virich (CPSO#: 88794 )
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE VIRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIRICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE VIRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIRICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008