THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 16:32:24 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1580 Merivale Road
Ottawa Ontario K2G 4B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-226-4030
Fax: 613-225-3891

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vandana Parnandi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Parnandi (CPSO#: 88837 )
Business Address: Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Road
Orléans Ontario K4A 5E6
(613) 841-7009
Business Address: 309-1580 Merivale Road
Ottawa Ontario K2G 4B5
613-226-4030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TELUGU
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1580 Merivale Road
Ottawa Ontario K2G 4B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-226-4030
Fax: 613-225-3891

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vandana Parnandi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Parnandi (CPSO#: 88837 )
Business Address: Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Road
Orléans Ontario K4A 5E6
(613) 841-7009
Business Address: 309-1580 Merivale Road
Ottawa Ontario K2G 4B5
613-226-4030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VANDANA NIKHILA PARNANDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARNANDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VANDANA NIKHILA PARNANDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARNANDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008