THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:08:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Blvd.
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: (519) 740-4938

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Nov 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Puopolo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Puopolo (CPSO#: 88840 )
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2330

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Blvd.
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: (519) 740-4938

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Nov 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Puopolo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Puopolo (CPSO#: 88840 )
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2330

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA KATHERINE PUOPOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUOPOLO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA KATHERINE PUOPOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUOPOLO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008