THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 04:55:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: EXR Medical Imaging Head Office
1815 Ironstone Manor, Suite 15b
Pickering Ontario L1W 3W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 831-1800
Fax: (905) 831-1806

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Shoichet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shoichet (CPSO#: 88856 )
Business Address: Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Site
100 Frank Miller
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
(705) 789-2311
Business Address: Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital Site
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
(705) 645-4404
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: Scarborough Health Network Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400

Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Sep 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: EXR Medical Imaging Head Office
1815 Ironstone Manor, Suite 15b
Pickering Ontario L1W 3W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 831-1800
Fax: (905) 831-1806

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Shoichet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shoichet (CPSO#: 88856 )
Business Address: Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Site
100 Frank Miller
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
(705) 789-2311
Business Address: Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital Site
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
(705) 645-4404
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: Scarborough Health Network Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400

Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Sep 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIN JAMES SHOICHET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOICHET is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIN JAMES SHOICHET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOICHET is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008