THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:17:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 47 Liberty Street
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 265 Dundas St. East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carolyn Tram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tram (CPSO#: 88870 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Lakeridge Health - Ajax & Pickering
Critical Care Medicine
Ajax ON L1S 2J4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 47 Liberty Street
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 265 Dundas St. East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carolyn Tram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tram (CPSO#: 88870 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Lakeridge Health - Ajax & Pickering
Critical Care Medicine
Ajax ON L1S 2J4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLYN QUYEN NGOC TRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLYN QUYEN NGOC TRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008