THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 16:56:56 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough
Scarborough Ontario M1P2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Uxbridge Cottage Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
4 Campbell Dr
Uxbridge Ontario L9P 1S4
Phone: (905) 852-9771
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vela Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Vela (CPSO#: 88872 )

Corporation Name: Vela Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough
Scarborough Ontario M1P2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Uxbridge Cottage Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
4 Campbell Dr
Uxbridge Ontario L9P 1S4
Phone: (905) 852-9771
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vela Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Vela (CPSO#: 88872 )

Corporation Name: Vela Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KANNA JEYAVERNY VELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KANNA JEYAVERNY VELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008