THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:47:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Murray St
Mount Sinai Hospital
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
4th Floor, Box 13
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165864800
Fax: (416) 586-4804

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Irene Ying Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ying (CPSO#: 88879 )
Business Address: 60 Murray St
Mount Sinai Hospital
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
4th floor, Box 13
Toronto ON M5T 3L9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Murray St
Mount Sinai Hospital
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
4th Floor, Box 13
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165864800
Fax: (416) 586-4804

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Irene Ying Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ying (CPSO#: 88879 )
Business Address: 60 Murray St
Mount Sinai Hospital
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
4th floor, Box 13
Toronto ON M5T 3L9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRENE YING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRENE YING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008