THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:18:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Rd
Orléans Ontario K4A 5E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 841-7009
Fax: (613) 841-0106

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Rd
Orléans Ontario K4A 5E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 841-7009
Fax: (613) 841-0106

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER TANUSEPUTRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANUSEPUTRO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER TANUSEPUTRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANUSEPUTRO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008