THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 11:43:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
30 Bond Street
Bond Wing 7-080
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-5459
Fax: 416-864-6012

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles de Mestral Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. C. de Mestral (CPSO#: 88888 )
Business Address: G1-06 - 2075 Bayview
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4055
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
30 Bond Street
Bond Wing 7-080
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5459

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
30 Bond Street
Bond Wing 7-080
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-5459
Fax: 416-864-6012

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles de Mestral Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. C. de Mestral (CPSO#: 88888 )
Business Address: G1-06 - 2075 Bayview
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4055
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
30 Bond Street
Bond Wing 7-080
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5459

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES WILLIAM ARMAND DE MESTRAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE MESTRAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES WILLIAM ARMAND DE MESTRAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE MESTRAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008