THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:10:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 640 Ross Avenue East
Suite E
Timmins Ontario P4N 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 531-3267
Fax: (705) 531-3269

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 12 Aug 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 12 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: Anson General Hospital
LOCATION: Iroquois Falls

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jaclyn Bernardi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bernardi (CPSO#: 88901 )
Business Address: Timmins and District Hospital
E - 640 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8A2
(705) 531-3267

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 640 Ross Avenue East
Suite E
Timmins Ontario P4N 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 531-3267
Fax: (705) 531-3269

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 12 Aug 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 12 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: Anson General Hospital
LOCATION: Iroquois Falls

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jaclyn Bernardi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bernardi (CPSO#: 88901 )
Business Address: Timmins and District Hospital
E - 640 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8A2
(705) 531-3267

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACLYN CHRISTINE BERNARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNARDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACLYN CHRISTINE BERNARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNARDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008