THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:22:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sharbot Lake Family Health Team
1005 Medical Centre Rd
Sharbot Lake Ontario K0H 2P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 279-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. CUNIC MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cunic (CPSO#: 88925 )
Business Address: 210 Greenlees Dr
Kingston ON K7K 6P7
613-449-5579
Business Address: Rr 2
Sharbot Lake ON K0H 2P0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sharbot Lake Family Health Team
1005 Medical Centre Rd
Sharbot Lake Ontario K0H 2P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 279-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. CUNIC MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cunic (CPSO#: 88925 )
Business Address: 210 Greenlees Dr
Kingston ON K7K 6P7
613-449-5579
Business Address: Rr 2
Sharbot Lake ON K0H 2P0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNY CUNIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUNIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNY CUNIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUNIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008