THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 19:24:33 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Imaging Services
Royal Victorial Regional Health Ctr
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-728-9090
Extension: 43466
Fax: 705-739-5629

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Lougheed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lougheed (CPSO#: 88936 )
Business Address: Little Lake Health Centre
LL01
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
(705) 722-8036
Business Address: Barrie Medical Arts
Unit 114-115
121 Wellington Street West
Barrie Ontario L4N 1L2
(705) 726-4531
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Imaging Services
Royal Victorial Regional Health Ctr
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-728-9090
Extension: 43466
Fax: 705-739-5629

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Lougheed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lougheed (CPSO#: 88936 )
Business Address: Little Lake Health Centre
LL01
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
(705) 722-8036
Business Address: Barrie Medical Arts
Unit 114-115
121 Wellington Street West
Barrie Ontario L4N 1L2
(705) 726-4531
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS STEWART LOUGHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUGHEED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS STEWART LOUGHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUGHEED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008