THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:54:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Div of Neurosurgery, Suite 1503
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6125
Fax: (416) 813-4975

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corpration
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ibrahim (CPSO#: 89006 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurosurgery
Suite 1503
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-6125

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Div of Neurosurgery, Suite 1503
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6125
Fax: (416) 813-4975

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corpration
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ibrahim (CPSO#: 89006 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurosurgery
Suite 1503
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-6125

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008