THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:41:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Childrens Hospital
Department of Pediatric Surgery
Room 4E
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 73550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Choi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Choi (CPSO#: 89022 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatric Surgery
Room 4E
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73550
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Childrens Hospital
Department of Pediatric Surgery
Room 4E
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 73550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Choi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Choi (CPSO#: 89022 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatric Surgery
Room 4E
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73550
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008