THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:08:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36 King St.
Brantford Ontario N3T 3C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 752-4340
Fax: (519) 752-6096
Address: 18 Centre St.
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1E9
Phone: (905) 889-3634
Fax: (905) 889-3986

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wong & Ho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ho (CPSO#: 92897 ) Dr. G. Wong (CPSO#: 89026 )
Business Address: 36 King Street
Brantford Ontario N3T 3C5
(519) 752-4340
Business Address: 18 Centre Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1E9
(905) 889-3634

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36 King St.
Brantford Ontario N3T 3C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 752-4340
Fax: (519) 752-6096
Address: 18 Centre St.
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1E9
Phone: (905) 889-3634
Fax: (905) 889-3986

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wong & Ho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ho (CPSO#: 92897 ) Dr. G. Wong (CPSO#: 89026 )
Business Address: 36 King Street
Brantford Ontario N3T 3C5
(519) 752-4340
Business Address: 18 Centre Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1E9
(905) 889-3634

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARWAY MATTHEW VICTOR WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARWAY MATTHEW VICTOR WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008