THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:40:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: City of Lakes Family Health Team
25 Black Lake Road
Lively Ontario P3Y 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 692-1018
Fax: (705) 692-7156

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Mar 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Liisa Levasseur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Levasseur (CPSO#: 89030 )
Business Address: 25 Black Lake Rd
Lively ON P3Y 1J3
7056921018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: City of Lakes Family Health Team
25 Black Lake Road
Lively Ontario P3Y 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 692-1018
Fax: (705) 692-7156

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Mar 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Liisa Levasseur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Levasseur (CPSO#: 89030 )
Business Address: 25 Black Lake Rd
Lively ON P3Y 1J3
7056921018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIISA KIMBERLEY LEVASSEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVASSEUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIISA KIMBERLEY LEVASSEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVASSEUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Mar 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008