THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 06:21:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emergency Department
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 19 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Mak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Mak (CPSO#: 89032 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emergency Department
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 19 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Mak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Mak (CPSO#: 89032 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008