THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:34:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, KACHCHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Queensway West
Suite 200
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-270-4871
Fax: 905-785-6165
Address: 260 Nebo Rd
200
Hamilton ON L8W 3K5
Phone: 226-243-6608
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 148 Manitou Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2C 1L3
Phone: 2262438971
Fax: 8334670866
Address: 328 Highway 7
Suite 301
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P7
Phone: 9057803292
Fax: 9052377801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 29 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abbas Merali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Merali (CPSO#: 89037 )
Business Address: Belmont Professional Centre
Suite 309
564 Belmont Avenue
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
(519) 744-1167
Business Address: 435 The Boardwalk
Suite 207
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
5197441167

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, KACHCHI
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Queensway West
Suite 200
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-270-4871
Fax: 905-785-6165
Address: 260 Nebo Rd
200
Hamilton ON L8W 3K5
Phone: 226-243-6608
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 148 Manitou Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2C 1L3
Phone: 2262438971
Fax: 8334670866
Address: 328 Highway 7
Suite 301
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P7
Phone: 9057803292
Fax: 9052377801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 29 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abbas Merali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Merali (CPSO#: 89037 )
Business Address: Belmont Professional Centre
Suite 309
564 Belmont Avenue
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
(519) 744-1167
Business Address: 435 The Boardwalk
Suite 207
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
5197441167

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABBAS MUHAMMAD MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABBAS MUHAMMAD MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008