THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 03:42:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Main St W
Abundance Healthcare
Hamilton ON L8P 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6476208499
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Dept of Emergency Medicine
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 9055221155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Ewen Rd
Hamilton ON L8S 3C4
Phone: 905-540-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brendon Trotter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Trotter (CPSO#: 89039 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Main St W
Abundance Healthcare
Hamilton ON L8P 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6476208499
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Dept of Emergency Medicine
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 9055221155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Ewen Rd
Hamilton ON L8S 3C4
Phone: 905-540-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brendon Trotter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Trotter (CPSO#: 89039 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENDON GORDON TROTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROTTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENDON GORDON TROTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROTTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 06 Mar 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 


Source: Other
Effective Date: 09 Nov 2015
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Brendon Trotter was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Impaired operation, or care or control of a motor vehicle, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

DATE: November 9, 2015
SENTENCE: 1 year driving prohibition; Fine of $1000.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 06 Mar 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 


Source: Other
Effective Date: 09 Nov 2015
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Brendon Trotter was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Impaired operation, or care or control of a motor vehicle, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

DATE: November 9, 2015
SENTENCE: 1 year driving prohibition; Fine of $1000.

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 05 Feb 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008