THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:43:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 university avenue
OPG Wing 6th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Extension: 5061
Fax: 416-946-2288

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Bouchard-Fortier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bouchard-Fortier (CPSO#: 89042 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
OPG Wing 6th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501 Extn: 5061

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 university avenue
OPG Wing 6th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Extension: 5061
Fax: 416-946-2288

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Bouchard-Fortier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bouchard-Fortier (CPSO#: 89042 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
OPG Wing 6th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501 Extn: 5061

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE MAUDE LOUISE BOUCHARD-FORTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHARD-FORTIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE MAUDE LOUISE BOUCHARD-FORTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHARD-FORTIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008